or + to compare each pair of numbers.\r\n10. 3 21 11. 4\r\n2 14 12. 2 4\r\n2\r\n11\r\n3 3 5 15\r\n8 48\r\nSolve each Problem.\r\n13. 2 \u00be 14. 2 x 3 15. 1 \uf0b8 5\r\n+1 \u2153 3 5 4 8\r\n16. Keisha bought sixteen cans of soda for a birthday party. Six of these are cans of cola.\r\na. What fraction of the soda is cola (red)?\r\n= Red\r\nb. What is the ratio of cola to flavors that are not cola?\r\nWrite <,>, or = to compare the pair of decimals.\r\n17. 0.65 0.605 18. 0.329 0.48 19. 1.14 1.042\r\n20. Which expression can be used to find the width of each board?\r\nBoard\r\n18\u201d\r\na. 18+ (3 x 0.375) d. 18-(3 x 0.375)\r\n4 4\r\nb. 18+ (3 x 0.375) e. 18 \u2013(4 x 0.375)\r\n3 4\r\nc. 18- (3 x 0.375)\r\n3\r\ngap 0.375\r\n7\r\n6\r\nth Grade\r\n174\r\n7\r\nth\r\nGrade\r\n156\r\n8\r\nth Grade 170\r\nSolve each problem.\r\n21. 5.08 22. 2.05 x 0.06 = 23. 2.842 \uf0b8 1.4 =\r\n -2.92\r\n24. The Clothes Tree is offering a 25% discount on all women\u2019s sweaters. Including a 6% sales tax,\r\nwhat will Selena pay for a sweater that normally sells for $48.00?\r\nFor problem 25 & 26, refer to the circle graph.\r\n25. What percent of the students at Highland Middle School are in the 8\r\nth grade?\r\n26. Suppose that next year the enrollment at Highland Middle School increases by 20%. How many\r\nstudents will be enrolled at Highland next year?\r\n27. What is the ratio of the amount that Jonathan saved in May to the amount he saved in January?\r\n(Reduce to lowest terms. If necessary)\r\nIf Jonathan\u2019s take-home pay is 1,500 per month, how much did he save during the 6 months\r\nshown on the graph?\r\n30\r\n25\r\n20\r\n15\r\n10\r\n5\r\n0\r\nJan Feb Mar Apr May Jun\r\n8\r\n1. 1,695\r\n2. 19,135\r\n3. 21\r\nR 18\r\n4. 1,854\r\n5. 4,498\r\n6. 263\r\n7. $ 7.00 ($4.50 + $2.50)\r\n8. 4%, 30%, 0.34, 0.4, 2\/3, \u00be\r\n9. 62.5%\r\n10.\r\n<\r\n11.\r\n=\r\n12.\r\n>\r\n13.\r\n4\r\n\u2013\r\n\u00bd\r\n14. 2\/5\r\n15. 2\/5\r\n16. a. 3\/8 (6\/16) b. 3\/5 or\r\n3 to\r\n5 (6\/10)\r\n17.\r\n>\r\n18.\r\n<\r\n19.\r\n>\r\n20. d.\r\n21. 2.16\r\n22. 0.123\r\n23. 2.03\r\n24. $38.16 ($36.00+ $2.16)\r\n25. 34% (170\/500\r\nx 100%)\r\n26. 600 (500\r\n+ 100)\r\n27. 5\/3 (25\/15)\r\nAnswer Key\r\n9\r\nNEXT STEP: GO ON TO\r\nPRACTICE TESTS 1 AND 2.\r\n(Note: This page has space for portion and for overall test score.)\r\nDirections: 1) Take the portion of the test that follows. Label and do all work on front\r\nand back of same page as problem.\r\n2) See pages 42-44 for answer key, to score portion.\r\n3) Provide the following information hereon (page 10) for tutor- and selfevaluation:\r\nTotal number of problems: 24 Add, subtract, multiply, divide, whole numbers\r\nNumber correct: Multiply number correct X 100 =\r\nDivide by total number of problems = %\r\nTutor will review for areas to work on in math.\r\nAreas to work on: , , ,\r\nOVERALL MATH REVIEW SCORE\r\nTotal number of problems (overall): 104\r\nNumber correct: Multiply number correct X 100 =\r\nDivide by total number of problems = %\r\nTutor will review for areas to work on in math.\r\nAreas to work on: , , ,\r\nMath Review\r\n10\r\n6 5 9\r\n462\r\n+133\r\n595\r\nBasic Addition and Subtraction\r\nBasic Addition Steps:\r\n462+133 1. Line up digits according to place value.\r\nCheck by: 595 2. Add the digits starting from right to left:\r\n- 133 Ones: 2 + 3 = 5\r\n462 must be the answer Tens: 6 + 3 = 9\r\nHundreds: 4 + 1 = 5\r\nAddition w\/ Regrouping Steps:\r\n835+559 1. Line up the digits according to place value.\r\nCheck by: 1,394 2. Add:\r\n- 599 Ones: 5+9 = 14\r\n835 must be the answer (carry the 1 to the tens place, which is\r\none place to the left)\r\nTens: 1+ 3+ 5= 9\r\nHundreds: 8+ 5= 13\r\nBasic Subtraction Steps:\r\n5,234 \u2013 4,112 1. Line up the digits according to place value.\r\nCheck by: 1,122 2. Subtract:\r\n+4,112 Ones: 4 \u2013 2 = 2\r\n5,234 must be the answer Tens: 3 \u2013 1 = 2\r\nHundreds: 2 \u2013 1 = 1\r\nThousands: 5 \u2013 4 = 1\r\nSubtraction with Regrouping Steps:\r\n457 \u2013 29 1. Line up the digits according to place value.\r\nCheck by: 428 2. Subtract:\r\n+ 29 Ones: 7 \u2013 9 (must borrow 1 from the 5\r\n457 must be the answer In the tens place)\r\nTens 4 \u2013 2 = 2\r\nHundreds: 4 \u2013 0 = 4\r\nVocabulary:\r\nDigit: A numeral, (the number 7 is a digit).\r\nPlace Value: Each digit in a number occupies a\r\nposition \u2013 that position is called its place value.\r\nHESI Hints:\r\n1 Ten = 10 ones\r\n1 Hundred = 100 ones\r\n1 Thousand = 1000 ones\r\nNow you try!\r\n1. 1,803 + 156 =\r\n2. 835 + 145 =\r\n3. 1,372 + 139\r\n4. 123 + 54 + 23 =\r\n5. 673 \u2013 241 =\r\n6. 547 \u2013 88 =\r\n7. 222 \u2013 114 =\r\n8. 12,478 \u2013 467 =\r\n5,234\r\n- 4,112\r\n1,122Hundred\r\nTens\r\nOnes\r\n4 1 7\r\n4 5 7\r\n - 2 9\r\n4 2 8\r\n1\r\n835\r\n+ 559\r\n1394\r\n11\r\nBasic Multiplication\r\n(Whole Numbers)\r\n23 X 5 Steps:\r\n1. Multiply one digit at a time.\r\n2. Multiply (5 X 23)\r\nOnes: 5 x 3 = 15 (carry the 1 to the tens place\r\nand write the 5 in the ones place)\r\nTens: 5 x 2 = 10 + 1 = 11\r\n623 X 45 Steps:\r\n1. Multiply 623 X 5\r\n5 x 3 = 15\r\n5 x 2 = 10 + 1 (carried over)= 11\r\n5 x 6 = 30 + 1 (carried over)= 31 (doesn\u2019t need\r\nto be carried over)\r\n2. Multiply 623 x 4 (remember to line up the ones\r\ndigits with the four by using zero as the\r\nplaceholder):\r\n4 x 3 = 12\r\n4 x 2 = 8 + 1 = 9\r\n4 x 6 = 24\r\n3. Add the two products together:\r\n3,115 + 24,920 = 28,035 is the final product\r\nVocabulary:\r\nProduct: The answer to a multiplication problem.\r\nHESI Hints:\r\nRemember, the placeholders help keep the problem aligned. If you do not skip a space, the answer\r\nwill be incorrect. Below is an example of a well-aligned problem.\r\nNote: Timetables are crucial for doing multiplication, division, fractions, etc. Please notify the tutor if\r\nyou do not know timesheets by heart at least through 9 x 9.\r\n623\r\nx 45\r\n3115\r\n24,920\r\n28,035\r\n1\r\n23\r\nx 5\r\n115\r\n12\r\n51\r\n301\r\nSteps:\r\n1. Multiply 301 x 1\r\n\u27a2 1 x 1 = 1\r\n\u27a2 1 x 0 = 0\r\n\u27a2 1 x 3 = 3\r\n2. Multiply 301 x 5\r\n\u27a2 5 x 1 = 5 ( remember\r\nto use a zero for a\r\nplaceholder)\r\n\u27a2 5 x 0 = 0\r\n\u27a2 5 x 3 = 15\r\n3. Multiply 301 x 4\r\n\u27a2 4 x 1 = 4\r\n\u27a2 4 x 0 = 0\r\n\u27a2 4 x 3 = 12\r\n4. Add the three products\r\ntogether:\r\n\u27a2 301 + 15,050 +\r\n120,400 = 135,751 is\r\nthe final product\r\n301 x 4\r\nx 451\r\n301\r\nNow You Try!\r\n15050\r\n+120400 1. 846 x 7 =\r\n135,751 2. 325 x 6 =\r\n3. 653 x 12 =\r\n4. 806 x 55 =\r\n5. 795 x 14 =\r\n6. 999 x 22 =\r\n7. 582 x 325 =\r\n8. 9,438 x 165 =\r\n13\r\nBasic Division\r\n(Whole Numbers)\r\n40\uf0b8 8 = Steps:\r\n1. Set up the problem. (Review the vocabulary section).\r\n2. Use a series of multiplication and subtraction problems to\r\nsolve a division problem.\r\n3. 8 x ?= 40\r\nMultiply: 8 x 5 = 40\r\nSubtract: 40-40=0\r\nThe quotient (or answer) is 5\r\n672\uf0b8 6 = Steps:\r\n1. Set up the problem.\r\n2. Begin with the hundreds place:\r\no 6 x ?=6; we know 6 x 1 =6; Therefore, place the\r\n1(quotient) above the 6 hundred (dividend). Place the\r\nother 6 under the hundred and subtract: 6-6=0\r\no Bring down the next number which is 7; 6 x ? = 7.\r\nThere is no number that can be multiplied by six that\r\nwill equal seven exactly, so try to get as close as\r\npossible without going over 7. Use 6x1=6 and set it up\r\njust like the last subtraction problem. 7-6 =1\r\no Bring down the 2 from the dividend which results in\r\nthe number 12 (the 1 came from the remainder of 7-\r\n6=1).\r\no 6x?=12;?=2 The two becomes the next number in the\r\nquotient. 12- 12=0. There is not a remainder.\r\no The quotient (or answer) is 112.\r\nVocabulary\r\nQuotient: The answer to a division problem.\r\nDividend: The number being divided.\r\nDivisor: The number by which the dividend is divided.\r\nHESI Hints:\r\nThe 5 represents the divisor, the 45 represents the dividend, and the 9 represents the\r\nquotient. It is the best not to leave a division problem with a remainder, but to end it as\r\na fraction or a decimal point instead. To make the problem into a decimal, just add a\r\ndecimal point and zeros at the end of the dividend and continue. If a remainder\r\ncontinues to occur, round to the hundredths place.\r\nExample:\r\n233.547\u2192 233.55 (the 7 rounds the 4 to a 5)\r\nSteps to Division\r\n1. Division\r\n2. Multiplication\r\n3. Subtraction\r\n4. Bring down","promotional_price":null,"promotional_time":null,"free_item":"0","price":"25","category_name":"HESI","category_slug":"hesi","subcategories":null}, $event)">